Gilmore v. Martin County Sheriff Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher John Gilmore
Defendant: Martin County Sheriff Dept., Mayor Becky Foster, Sheriff Marquardt, Tania Rathman, Fairmont Police Dept. and Officer Jaime Bleess
Case Number: 0:2019cv00141
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER/REQUEST TO JUDGE WILHELMINA M. WRIGHT re: add a defendant to case (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 CORRESPONDENCE/LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Christopher John Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/28/2019. (TMA) cc:Christopher John Gilmore. Modified text on 3/1/2019 (MMG).
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher John Gilmore re #1 Prisoner Complaint. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/27/2019 (KMH).
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Christopher John Gilmore. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/27/2019 (KMH).
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION FOR ORDER OF PRISONER RELEASE filed by Christopher John Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/27/2019 (KMH).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Plaintiff Christopher John Gilmore must file within 30 days of the date of this Order (1) a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), Form No. AO 239; (2) a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form), Form No. AO 240, or (3) a document containing information comparable to that required by Form No. AO 239 or Form No. AO 240. If Gilmore does not file this material within 30 days of the date of this Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/20/2019. (TMA) cc: Christopher John Gilmore with AO-239 and AO-240 forms. Modified text on 2/21/2019 (lmb).
January 24, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) cc:Christopher John Gilmore. Modified text on 1/25/2019 (MMG).
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff re #1 Prisoner Complaint, #7 Brief by Christopher John Gilmore. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/24/2019 (KMH).
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER BRIEF re #1 Prisoner Complaint filed by Plaintiff. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/24/2019 (KMH).
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher John Gilmore. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/24/2019 (KMH).
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Christopher John Gilmore. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/24/2019 (KMH).
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Order of Subpoena filed by Christopher John Gilmore. (kt) Modified file date on 1/22/2019 (kt). Document QC'd by KMH on 1/24/2019 (KMH).
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Christopher John Gilmore. (kt) Modified file date on 1/22/2019 (kt). Document QC'd by KMH on 1/24/2019 (KMH).
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Christopher John Gilmore. (kt) Modified file date on 1/22/2019 (kt). Document QC'd by KMH on 1/24/2019 (KMH).
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christopher John Gilmore. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kt)cc: Gilmore. (kt) Modified file date on 1/22/2019 (kt). Document QC'd by KMH on 1/24/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. Martin County Sheriff Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin County Sheriff Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Becky Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tania Rathman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairmont Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jaime Bleess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher John Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?