Pjanic v. ClearPath Lending, Inc.
Plaintiff: Caron Pjanic and Caron A. Pjanic
Defendant: ClearPath Lending, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00148
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Robbins, Joseph)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: Per Request of the parties, the Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 09:00 AM is RESCHEDULED. The Pretrial Conference will commence on 4/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. NOTE: The deadlines in the Court's Notice of Pretrial Conference (ECF No. 4) are similarly extended by one month. (KAT)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by ClearPath Lending, Inc. Joint Letter Requesting Continuance of Pretrial Conference. (Baker, Allyson)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for ClearPath Lending, Inc.. (Lisle, Erin)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Allyson B Baker for ClearPath Lending, Inc..; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph Robbins for ClearPath Lending, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/4/2019. (JGK)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph L. Robbins. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6642604 filed by ClearPath Lending, Inc.. (Berens, Barbara)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Allyson B. Baker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6642594 filed by ClearPath Lending, Inc.. (Berens, Barbara)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by ClearPath Lending, Inc.. (Berens, Barbara)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Allyson B. Baker, Joseph L. Robbins as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (KAT)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd, 4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-148 (JRT/KMM). (MMP)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant ClearPath Lending, Inc.. (Berens, Barbara)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6616473) filed by ClearPath Lending, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons & Complain, #2 Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Berens, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pjanic v. ClearPath Lending, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caron Pjanic
Represented By: Elizabeth Christie Goodell
Represented By: Vildan A Teske
Represented By: Marisa C Katz
Represented By: Brittany McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caron A. Pjanic
Represented By: Elizabeth Christie Goodell
Represented By: Vildan A Teske
Represented By: Marisa C Katz
Represented By: Brittany McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClearPath Lending, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Represented By: Erin K Fogarty Lisle
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Represented By: Joseph Robbins
Represented By: Allyson B Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?