Manger et al v. Altringer et al
Plaintiff: Helen A. Manger and Helen Lepire Manger Trust, the
Defendant: Nicole Mary Ann Altringer, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and United States of America, the
Case Number: 0:2019cv00189
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 Wells Fargo's ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Savran, Jessica)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #9 Stipulation. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank has until 3/18/2019, to answer or otherwise defend in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/4/2019. (VLM)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Webber, Charles)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Helen A. Manger and The Helen Lepire Manger Trust. (Webber, Charles)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by United States of America, the. (Hoskins, Adam)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nicole Mary Ann Altringer re #6 Notice of Appearance (Thomas, Benjamin)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin E Thomas on behalf of Nicole Mary Ann Altringer. (Thomas, Benjamin)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER in Response to #3 Request. The United States is granted an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint up to and including 02/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/29/2019. (VLM)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request for Enlargement of Time to Answer #3 Request. (Hoskins, Adam)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT by United States of America, the. (Hoskins, Adam)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-189 (MJD/LIB). (lmb)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State Court in the Seventh Judicial District - Otter Tail County, case number Case not yet filed filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Amended Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hoskins, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manger et al v. Altringer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Mary Ann Altringer
Represented By: Benjamin E Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jessica Z Savran
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, the
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen A. Manger
Represented By: James A. Teigland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Lepire Manger Trust, the
Represented By: James A. Teigland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?