Upper River Services, L.L.C. v. Heiderscheid
Plaintiff: Upper River Services, LLC and Upper River Services, L.L.C.
Defendant: Andrew Heiderscheid
Case Number: 0:2019cv00242
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Upper River Services, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Howard, Giles)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Andrew Heiderscheid.(Bosch, Gerald)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Andrew Heiderscheid.(Bosch, Gerald)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Andrew Heiderscheid. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s))(Bosch, Gerald)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Bosch, Gerald)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald W Bosch on behalf of Andrew Heiderscheid. (Bosch, Gerald)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Andrew Heiderscheid. (Bosch, Gerald)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Giles B. Howard for Upper River Services, L.L.C.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/6/2019. (NAH)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting [3-1] Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel of Giles B. Howard for Upper River Services, L.L.C.. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/6/2019. (NAH)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Heiderscheid. (JLB)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-242 SRN/ECW. (JLB)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Giles B. Howard. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6644224 filed by Upper River Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Settergren, Neal) Modified text on 2/6/2019 (NAH).
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Upper River Services, LLC. (Settergren, Neal)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Heiderscheid (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6643878) filed by Upper River Services, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Settergren, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upper River Services, L.L.C. v. Heiderscheid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Heiderscheid
Represented By: Gerald W Bosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Upper River Services, LLC
Represented By: Neal W Settergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Upper River Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Giles B. Howard
Represented By: Neal W Settergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?