General Mills, Inc v. Retrobrands USA, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: General Mills, Inc and General Mills, Inc.
Defendant: Retrobrands USA, L.L.C., Jeffrey L Kaplan and Jeffrey L. Kaplan
Case Number: 0:2019cv00258
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 Return Receipt from Hennepin County District Court re: Received Order of Remand. (MMP)
April 17, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Hennepin County Court Administrator re: Remand Order. (KNK)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO REMAND (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 4/12/2019. (KMW)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #12 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/5/2019. (TJB)
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, by Jeffrey L. Kaplan, Retrobrands USA, L.L.C.. Jointly Signed by General Mills, Inc.. (Christensen, Carl)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #9 Memorandum - Plaintiff's Response and Request for Remand filed by General Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hulse, Benjamin)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Carl E. Christensen re #9 Memorandum by Jeffrey L. Kaplan, Retrobrands USA, L.L.C. in Support of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - C)(Christensen, Carl)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM re #7 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court, 8 Order of Entry,, filed by Jeffrey L. Kaplan, Retrobrands USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Christensen, Carl)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) ORDER. Defendant's oral request for an extension of time to brief the issue of jurisdiction to this Court is GRANTED. By February 25, 2019, the parties shall either stipulate to remand or brief the issue as follows: a. No later than February 25, 2019, Defendants shall file a brief that conforms to the word/line limits of Local Rule 7.1(f). b. No later than March 4, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a responsive brief that conforms to the word/line limits of Local Rule 7.1(f). Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 2/22/2019. (KMW)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. By February 21, 2019, the parties shall either stipulate to remand or brief the issue as follows: a. No later than February 21, 2019, Defendants shall file a brief that conforms to the word/line limits of Local Rule 7.1(f). b. No later than February 28, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a responsive brief that conforms to the word/line limits of Local Rule 7.1(f). Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 2/14/2019. (KMW)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, to Extend Time to Answer by Jeffrey L. Kaplan, Retrobrands USA, L.L.C.. Jointly Signed by General Mills, Inc.. (Christensen, Carl)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by General Mills, Inc. Waiver returned on 2/4/19, answer due 4/5/19. (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (kt).
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff General Mills, Inc.. (Hulse, Benjamin)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Copyright/Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-258 NEB/DTS. (kt)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Christensen, Carl)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota, Fourth Judicial District, County of Hennepin, case number 27-CV-19-971 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6648816) filed by Retrobrands USA, L.L.C.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint) (Christensen, Carl) Modified text on 2/6/2019 (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Mills, Inc v. Retrobrands USA, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retrobrands USA, L.L.C.
Represented By: Carl E Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L. Kaplan
Represented By: Carl E Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Mills, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Mills, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Jerry W Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?