Palkon v. CenturyLink Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Palkon
Defendant: Peter C Brown, Sunit S Patel, Kevin P Chilton, Laurie A Siegel, Steven T Clontz, W. Bruce Hanks, Jeffrey K Storey, Harvey P Perry, Virginia Boulet, Glen F Post, III, CenturyLink Inc., Michael J Roberts, Mary L Landrieu, David D. Cole, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, T. Michael Glenn and Martha H Bejar
Case Number: 0:2019cv00284
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 3:18-cv-00998. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez per MDL List.
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER directing transfer to District of Minnesota, In Re: CenturyLink Sales Practices and Securities Litigation, MDL # 2795. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/6/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Transfer Order in MDL No.2795, IN RE: CenturyLink Sales Practices and Securities Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the District of Minnesota upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/6/2019.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Cases (1) Flanders v Post et al 3:18-cv-0753 and (2) Ault v Post et al 3:18-cv-0755 by Dennis Palkon. (aty,Meade, John) Modified on 8/8/2018 to add related cases (Putch, A). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/6/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Brett D. Stecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dennis Palkon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/6/2018. (crt,Putch, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/6/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Brett D. Stecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3719586) by Dennis Palkon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Meade, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/6/2019.]
August 5, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/5/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/6/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Martha H Bejar, Virginia Boulet, Peter C Brown, CenturyLink Inc, Kevin P Chilton, Steven T Clontz, David D Cole, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, T Michael Glenn, W Bruce Hanks, Mary L Landrieu, Sunit S Patel, Harvey P Perry, Glen F Post, III, Michael J Roberts, Laurie A Siegel and Jeffrey K Storey (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/6/2019.]
August 1, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/6/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martha H Bejar, Virginia Boulet, Peter C Brown, CenturyLink Inc, Kevin P Chilton, Steven T Clontz, David D Cole, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, T Michael Glenn, W Bruce Hanks, Mary L Landrieu, Sunit S Patel, Harvey P Perry, Glen F Post, III, Michael J Roberts, Laurie A Siegel and Jeffrey K Storey with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3717308) filed by Dennis Palkon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Affidavit Verification, #8 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Alden Meade added to party Dennis Palkon(pty:pla))(aty,Meade, John) Modified on 8/2/2018 (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palkon v. CenturyLink Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter C Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunit S Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin P Chilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie A Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T Clontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Bruce Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey K Storey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey P Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Boulet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen F Post, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary L Landrieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David D. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Stewart Ewing, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Michael Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha H Bejar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Palkon
Represented By: John Alden Meade
Represented By: Brett D. Stecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?