United States of America v. $34,460 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $34,460 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Alphonso Grant, Jr.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00290
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Hudleston, Sarah)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Alfonso Grant. (Hudleston, Sarah)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of PUBLICATION by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Hudleston, Sarah)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Beth B. Finkelstein as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 VERIFIED CLAIM by Alphonso Grant, Jr (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 4/1/2019 (KMH).
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $34,460.00 in U.S. Currency. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 3/12/2019 (KMH).
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued conventionally. (AKL)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-290 (ECT/HB). (MMP)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $34,460 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hudleston, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $34,460 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $34,460 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah E. Hudleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alphonso Grant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?