Polaris Industries Inc v. TBL International Inc.

Plaintiff: Polaris Industries Inc and Polaris Industries Inc.
Defendant: TBL International Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00291
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Polaris Industries Inc.. TBL International Inc. served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Kliebenstein, Heather)
February 13, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Eric C. Tostrud recused. Case reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-291 WMW/DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 2/12/2019. (kt)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to TBL International Inc.. (KNK)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-291 (ECT/DTS). (KNK)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Kliebenstein, Heather)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Polaris Industries Inc. (Kliebenstein, Heather)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TBL International Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6657267) filed by Polaris Industries Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kliebenstein, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polaris Industries Inc v. TBL International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBL International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polaris Industries Inc
Represented By: Heather J Kliebenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polaris Industries Inc.
Represented By: Paige S Stradley
Represented By: Heather J Kliebenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?