Keystone Retaining Wall Systems, LLC v. Oldcastle Architectural, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Keystone Retaining Wall Systems, LLC
Defendant: Anchor Wall Systems, Inc., Anchor Wall Engineering, LLC and Oldcastle Architectural, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00329
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #13 Stipulation.Defendants Oldcastle Architectural, Inc., Anchor Wall Engineering, LLC, and Anchor Wall Systems, Inc. shall have until and including April 19, 2019 to answer or otherwise plead and/or respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/28/2019. (TMA)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Stipulation. (Carlson, Alan)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Anchor Wall Engineering, LLC, Anchor Wall Systems, Inc., Oldcastle Architectural, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Keystone Retaining Wall Systems, LLC. (Carlson, Alan)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Nikolai, James)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #9 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/5/2019. (SGK)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Carlson, Alan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Anchor Wall Engineering, LLC, Anchor Wall Systems, Inc., Oldcastle Architectural, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Keystone Retaining Wall Systems, LLC. (Carlson, Alan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W Winkels on behalf of Anchor Wall Engineering, LLC, Anchor Wall Systems, Inc., Oldcastle Architectural, Inc.. (Winkels, Joseph)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan G Carlson on behalf of Anchor Wall Engineering, LLC, Anchor Wall Systems, Inc., Oldcastle Architectural, Inc.. (Carlson, Alan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Keystone Retaining Wall Systems, LLC re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint,, #5 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Nikolai, James)
February 12, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Anchor Wall Engineering, LLC, Anchor Wall Systems, Inc., Oldcastle Architectural, Inc. (lmb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Patent) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-932 WMW/ECW. (lmb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Paul G. Joyce; Marybeth P. Mantharam as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Contech Engineered Solutions, LLC is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Keystone Retaining Wall Systems, LLC. Quikrete Holdings, Inc. is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Keystone Retaining Wall Systems, LLC. (Nikolai, James)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Oldcastle Architectural, Inc., Anchor Wall Engineering, LLC, Anchor Wall Systems, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMNDC-6664181) filed by Keystone Retaining Wall Systems, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-3, #2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action regarding a Patent or Trademark, ATTACHMENTS 3 THROUGH 5 FILED IN ERROR-#3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nikolai, James) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keystone Retaining Wall Systems, LLC v. Oldcastle Architectural, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Wall Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph W Winkels
Represented By: Alan G Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Wall Engineering, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W Winkels
Represented By: Alan G Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oldcastle Architectural, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph W Winkels
Represented By: Alan G Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keystone Retaining Wall Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jorgen Lervick
Represented By: James T Nikolai
Represented By: Jorgen M. Lervick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?