Larkin v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Corina Larkin
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00380
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Ann D Montgomery
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2019. Fact Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 12/13/2019. Motions (disp) due by 1/15/2020. Ready for trial due by 3/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/29/2019. (JMK)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/28/2019. A written Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (JMK)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Corina Larkin.(Moen, Brian)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/21/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Moen, Brian)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Corina Larkin. filed by Corina Larkin. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Alden, Charlie) Modified text on 2/22/2019 (MMP).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, is extended through and including February 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/20/2019. (JMK)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Moen, Brian)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Corina Larkin. (Moen, Brian)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-380 ADM/HB. (MMG)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Moen, Brian)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Kohl's Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Moen, Brian)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6674198) filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Moen, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larkin v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corina Larkin
Represented By: Charlie R Alden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Moen
Represented By: Patrick R Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?