Monacelli v Kemper Sports Management, Inc.

Plaintiff: Deborah Monacelli
Defendant: Kemper Sports Management, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00399
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deborah Monacelli. Kemper Sports Management, Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Anderson, Jordan)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). (Anderson, Jordan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kemper Sports Management, Inc.. (MMG)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Copyright & Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-399 PJS/SER. (MMG)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kemper Sports Management, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6680928) filed by Deborah Monacelli. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Parker, Boris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monacelli v Kemper Sports Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemper Sports Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Monacelli
Represented By: Boris Parker
Represented By: Jordan W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?