Carter v. 3457 Central Ave. NE, LLC et al

Plaintiff: tebra carter
Defendant: 3457 Central Ave. NE, LLC, Defendant ClearCreek Properties, Ltd., Lance Redfield and ClearCreek Properties, Ltd.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00412
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to 3457 Central Ave. NE, LLC, Lance Redfield, ClearCreek Properties, Ltd. filed by Tebra Carter. Waiver sent 3/7/19. Answer due 5/6/2019. (Iris, Mark) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (CLK).
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to 3457 Central Ave. NE, LLC, ClearCreek Properties, Ltd., Lance Redfield. (AKL)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Plaintiff's Letter Request at Docket No. 5 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons in this matter and Plaintiff is allowed to serve the Defendants' attorney directly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/6/2019. (MSK)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tebra Carter re: Summons. (Iris, Mark)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/22/2019. (KLL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accomomdations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-412 JRT/BRT. (JLB)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Tebra Carter. (Iris, Mark) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (JLB).
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3457 Central Ave. NE, LLC, ClearCreek Properties, Ltd., Lance Redfield filed by Tebra Carter. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Iris, Mark) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (JLB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. 3457 Central Ave. NE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: tebra carter
Represented By: Mark Iris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3457 Central Ave. NE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant ClearCreek Properties, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Redfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClearCreek Properties, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?