David Bishop v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: David Bishop
Defendant: Michael Basnight, Abbott Laboratories and Does 1-25, inclusive
Case Number: 0:2019cv00420
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #46 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard Stavin for David Bishop. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/17/2019. (NAH)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric Ghiya Ruehe for Abbott Laboratories. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 4/17/2019. (NAH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Alan Stavin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6814702 filed by David Bishop. (Nelson Schaffer, Kaarin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for David Bishop. (Nelson Schaffer, Kaarin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for David Bishop. (Massie, Dustin)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/25/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 09:45 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/8/2019. (TMA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2019: #1 Consent Form) (MMP).
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Michael Basnight. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 4/4/2019. (KMW)
April 4, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric G. Ruehe. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6783763 filed by Abbott Laboratories, Michael Basnight. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Long, Colton)
April 3, 2019 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal AS TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL BASNIGHT by Michael Basnight. Jointly Signed by David Bishop. (Long, Colton)
March 20, 2019 Filing 39 Defendant Abbott Laboratories' ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Plaintiff filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Lloyd, Eric)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER on #36 Stipulation.Defendant Michael Basnights time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint is extended to April 3, 2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/20/2019. (TMA)
March 19, 2019 Filing 37 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #36 Stipulation. (Long, Colton)
March 19, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT M. BASNIGHTS TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Michael Basnight. Jointly Signed by David Bishop. (Long, Colton)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER on #32 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/5/2019. (SGK)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric M Lloyd for Abbott Laboratories and for Michael Basnight. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 3/4/2019. (NAH)
March 1, 2019 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #32 Stipulation. (Long, Colton)
March 1, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Abbott Laboratories, Michael Basnight. Jointly Signed by David Bishop. (Long, Colton)
February 28, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric M. Lloyd. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6701257 filed by Abbott Laboratories, Michael Basnight. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Long, Colton)
February 28, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Colton D. Long on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Michael Basnight. (Long, Colton)
February 21, 2019 Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard A. Stavin, Eric M. Lloyd, Eric G. Ruehe, Timothy M. Hoppe as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) cc: Richard A. Stavin, Eric M. Lloyd, Eric G. Ruehe, Timothy M. Hoppe. (kt) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (kt).
February 21, 2019 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-09769. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright per 3rd/4th Civil Rights List.
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order GRANTING Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 1404(a) (Dkt. #17 ) and DENYING Defendant Michael Basnight's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as Moot (Dkt. #19 ) by Judge Dale S. Fischer transferring case to District of Minnesota. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.)(SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #19 set for February 11, 2019 off calendar and under submission. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #19 filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Michael Basnight. (Lloyd, Eric) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #17 set for Monday, January 28, 2019, off calendar and under submission. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #19 filed by Plaintiff David Bishop. (Stavin, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicole A Bolson Baarts counsel for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Michael Basnight. Nicole A. Baarts is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Inc. and Michael Basnight. (Baarts, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss first amended complaint #17 filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Michael Basnight. (Lloyd, Eric) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 20 OPPOSITION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss first amended complaint #17 filed by Plaintiff David Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Stavin, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Michael Basnight. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendant Michael Basnight's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Nicole Baarts In Support of Defendant Michael Basnight's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration of Timothy Hoppe In Support of Defendant Michael Basnight's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Proposed Order) (Lloyd, Eric) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric G Ruehe on behalf of Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Michael Basnight (Attorney Eric G Ruehe added to party Abbott Laboratories(pty:dft), Attorney Eric G Ruehe added to party Michael Basnight(pty:dft))(Ruehe, Eric) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss first amended complaint filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Michael Basnight. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Nicole Baarts, #3 Declaration Jessica Paik, #4 Proposed Order) (Lloyd, Eric) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric M Lloyd on behalf of Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Michael Basnight (Attorney Eric M Lloyd added to party Abbott Laboratories(pty:dft), Attorney Eric M Lloyd added to party Michael Basnight(pty:dft))(Lloyd, Eric) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #1 ; Demand for Jury Trial against Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Michael Basnight, Does filed by Plaintiff David Bishop. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR COURT ORDER RE: LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO VACATE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE #9 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION to AMEND filed by Plaintiff David Bishop. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Stavin, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Re: Stipulation for Court Order Re: Extending the Time for Defendant Michael Basnight to File a Responsive Pleading #11 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Hearing re Complaint - (Discovery), STIPULATION to Allow to Intervene, STIPULATION for Issuance , STIPULATION for Joinder in Complaint - (Discovery) , JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner,, STIPULATION for Judgment as to, STIPULATION for Leave to extend time to file responsive pleading , STIPULATION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory , STIPULATION for New Trial filed by Plaintiff David Bishop David Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stavin, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Michael Basnight, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 served on 11/21/2018. (Baarts, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/7/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Jessica Paik, #3 Declaration Nicole Baarts, #4 Proposed Order) (Baarts, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: The standing order requires that the motion be set on a Monday at 1:30 p.m. The Court strikes the Motion to Dismiss, (Docket No. #7 ). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 **STRICKEN** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/3/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jessica Paik, #3 Declaration Declaration of Nicole Baarts, #4 Proposed Order) (Baarts, Nicole) Modified on 11/28/2018 (rfi). [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
November 20, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Bishop, upon Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc. served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. In compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/9/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
November 20, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Michael Basnight, Does 1-25. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff David Bishop. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/15/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Michael Basnight, identifying Abbott Laboratories, St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Baarts, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Michael Basnight. (Baarts, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC718241 Receipt No: 0973-22773363 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Michael Basnight. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole Baarts in Support of Michael Basnight's Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Other Served and Filed Pleadings, #4 Exhibit C - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt, #5 Exhibit D - Jury Verdicts, #6 Exhibit E - Jury Verdicts re fees, #7 Declaration of Michael Basnight in Support of Michael Basnight's Notice of Removal, #8 Declaration of Anna Curran in Support of Michael Basnight's Notice of Removal, #9 Declaration of Jessica Paik in Support of Michael Basnight's Notice of Removal) (Attorney Nicole A Bolson Baarts added to party Michael Basnight(pty:dft))(Baarts, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Bishop v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Basnight
Represented By: Eric M Lloyd
Represented By: Colton D. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Eric Ghiya Ruehe
Represented By: Eric M Lloyd
Represented By: Colton D. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bishop
Represented By: Richard Stavin
Represented By: Dustin W Massie
Represented By: Kaarin Nelson Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?