Makinen et al v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Raeanne Marie Brown and Brett Alan Makinen
Defendant: Ramsey CBOC Clinic, United States Office of General Counsel Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Minneapolis Veterans Administration Healthcare System and United States
Case Number: 0:2019cv00431
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States. filed by Brett Alan Makinen, Raeanne Marie Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KNK)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Conventionally as to United States. (kt)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Minneapolis Veterans Administration Healthcare System, Ramsey CBOC Clinic, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of General Counsel Department of Veterans Affairs. (MMP) cc: Makinen and Brown with attached InfoSheet 2 regarding service. Modified text on 2/25/2019 (MMP).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Minneapolis Veterans Administration Healthcare System, Ramsey CBOC Clinic, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of General Counsel Department of Veterans Affairs (filing fee $400, receipt number 44641102105) filed by Brett Alan Makinen, Raeanne Marie Brown. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) cc: Raeanne Brown and Brett Makinen. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/28/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makinen et al v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey CBOC Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of General Counsel Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minneapolis Veterans Administration Healthcare System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raeanne Marie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Alan Makinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?