Fredin v. City Pages et al
Plaintiff: Brock Fredin
Defendant: Michael Mullen and City Pages
Case Number: 0:2019cv00472
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Motion; granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1. The application to proceed in forma pauperis of plaintiff Brock Fredin (ECF No. 2) is GRANTED.2. Fredin must submit a properly completed Marshal Service Form (Form USM-285) for each defendant. If Fredin does not complete and return the Marshal Service Forms within 30 days of this order, it will be recommended that this matter be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Marshal Service Forms will be provided to Fredin by the Court.3. After the return of the completed Marshal Service Forms, the Clerk of Court is directed to seek waiver of service from each of the defendants, consistent with Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.4. If a defendant fails without good cause to sign and return a waiver within 30 days of the date that the waiver is mailed, the Court will impose upon that defendant the expenses later incurred in effecting service of process. Absent a showing of good cause, reimbursement of the costs of service is mandatory and will be imposed in all cases in which a defendant does not sign and return a waiver of service form. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(2).5. Fredin's motion to adjust filing fee (ECF No. 9) is DENIED.6. Fredin must pay the unpaid balance ($290.95) of the statutory filing fee for this action in the manner prescribed by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), and the Clerk of Court shall provide notice of this requirement to the authorities at the institution where Fredin is confined.7. All prior consistent orders remain in full force and effect. 8. Failure to comply with any provision of this Order or any other prior consistent Order shall subject the non-complying party, non-complying counsel and/or the party such counsel represents to any and all appropriate remedies, sanctions and the like, including without limitation: assessment of costs, fines and attorneys fees and disbursements; waiver of rights to object; exclusion or limitation of witnesses, testimony, exhibits and other evidence; striking of pleadings; complete or partial dismissal with prejudice; entry of whole or partial default judgment; and/or any other relief that this Court may from time to time deem appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/25/2019. (JRE)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brock Fredin re #8 Receipt, #9 MOTION to Adjust Filing Fee and Exempting PLRA (JLB)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION to Adjust Filing Fee and Exempting PLRA filed by Brock Fredin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(JLB)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIPT number 34641015508 in the amount of $59.05 issued to Brock Fredin. (JLB)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER in Response to #6 Letter to Magistrate Judge. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff Brock Fredin must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $59.05 within 20 days of the date of this order.2. Should Fredin fail to pay the initial partial filing fee, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute.3. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order and the Court's March 14, 2019 Order (ECF No. #5 ) to Fredin at the following address: Ramsey County Correctional Facility, 297 Century Boulevard, Maplewood, Minnesota 55119. The Clerk of Court shall also update Fredin's address on the docket.4. Fredin shall promptly update the Court with his new address upon his release from the Ramsey County Correctional Facility.5. Fredin's request to stay this matter is hereby DENIED without prejudice.6. All prior consistent orders remain in full force and effect. 7. Failure to comply with any provision of this Order or any other prior consistent Order shall subject the non-complying party, non-complying counsel and/or the party such counsel represents to any and all appropriate remedies, sanctions and the like, including without limitation: assessment of costs, fines and attorneys fees and disbursements; waiver of rights to object; exclusion or limitation of witnesses, testimony, exhibits and other evidence; striking of pleadings; complete or partial dismissal with prejudice; entry of whole or partial default judgment; and/or any other relief that this Court may from time to time deem appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/22/2019. (JRE) (cc: Fredin) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (AKL).
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brock Fredin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JLB) Document QC'd on 4/10/2019 (JGK).
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Brock Fredin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/14/2019. (HAM) (cc: Fredin) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (AKL).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Leung. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/28/2019. (las) (cc: Fredin) Modified text on 3/1/2019 (AKL).
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brock Fredin re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Brock Fredin, #1 Complaint. (lmb) Document QC'd on 3/19/2019 (JGK).
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Brock Fredin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd on 3/19/2019 (JGK).
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Pages, Michael Mullen filed by Brock Fredin. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (lmb) cc: Plaintiff. Document QC'd on 3/19/2019 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fredin v. City Pages et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Pages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Fredin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?