Thomas v. Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff: Stella Thomas
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 0:2019cv00482
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Wells Fargo & Company is a corporate parent of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank. (Chambers, Terran)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank. (Chambers, Terran)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Terran C Chambers on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank. (Chambers, Terran)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stella Thomas. Wells Fargo Bank served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Fiebiger, Rolf)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank. (JLB)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-482 (ECT/TNL). (JLB)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6696470) filed by Stella Thomas. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fiebiger, Rolf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Thomas
Represented By: Rolf Fiebiger
Represented By: Thomas D Fiebiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Terran C Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?