Iota Phi Lambda Sorority, Inc. v. Contenta Global Capital Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: IOTA Phi Lambda Sorority, Inc.
Defendant: Contenta Global Capital Group, Inc., Cheryl Broussard and Contenta Global Capital Group, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv00532
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Cheryl Broussard, Contenta Global Capital Group, LLC (CLK)
April 14, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Damon L. Ward re #11 Application for Entry of Default by Iota Phi Lambda Sorority, Inc. . (Ward, Damon)
April 14, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Cheryl Broussard and Contenta Global Capital Group, LLC. (Ward, Damon)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Damon L. Ward)(Ward, Damon) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (CLK).
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Iota Phi Lambda Sorority, Inc.. Contenta Global Capital Group, LLC served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Ward, Damon)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Iota Phi Lambda Sorority, Inc.. Cheryl Broussard served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Ward, Damon)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WRONG EVENT CODE-WILL REFILE-Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Contenta Global Capital Group, LLC on 3/11/2019, filed by Iota Phi Lambda Sorority, Inc.. (Ward, Damon) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (AKL).
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WRONG EVENT CODE-WILL REFILE-Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Cheryl Broussard on 3/11/2019, filed by Iota Phi Lambda Sorority, Inc.. (Ward, Damon) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (AKL).
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert T Goins, Sr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Goins, Albert)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cheryl Broussard, Contenta Global Capital Group, LLC. (lmb)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-532 (SRN/DTS). (lmb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Damon L Ward on behalf of IOTA Phi Lambda Sorority, Inc.. (Ward, Damon)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6709876) filed by Iota Phi Lambda Sorority, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Ward, Damon) Modified text on 3/6/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iota Phi Lambda Sorority, Inc. v. Contenta Global Capital Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contenta Global Capital Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contenta Global Capital Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOTA Phi Lambda Sorority, Inc.
Represented By: Damon L Ward
Represented By: Albert T Goins, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?