Mikulak v. Seyl Richardson et al
Plaintiff: Juanel Anthony Mikulak
Defendant: Holly Ann Perkins, Jeff Richardson and Samantha Mae Seyl Richardson
Case Number: 0:2019cv00768
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER to Prison re: Fees Due. (KDS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice on Appeal)(KDS) cc: Mikulak. Modified text on 7/1/2019 (KDS).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #15 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. This matter is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) as follows: a. All claims brought pursuant to federal or international law are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS FRIVOLOUS. b. All claims brought pursuant to state law are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The application to proceed in forma pauperis of plaintiff Juanel Anthony Mikulak #2 is DENIED. 3. Mikulak is directed to pay the unpaid balance ($350.00) of the statutory filing fee for this action in the manner prescribed by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), and the Clerk of Court directed to provide notice of this requirement to the authorities at the institution where Mikulak is confined. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/27/2019. (GRR) cc: Mikulak. Modified text on 7/1/2019 (KDS).
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Juanel Anthony Mikulak (ACH) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/27/2019 (KMH).
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTION to #15 Report and Recommendations filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ACH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #2 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 6/27/2019 (KMH).
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint and #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/29/2019. (HAM). cc: Mikulak on 5/30/2019 (KNK).
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION signed only by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/14/2019 (KMH).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER in Response to #12 Notice of Change of Address and Request for Extension. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/10/2019. (JRE) cc: Juanel Anthony Mikulak text on 5/14/2019 (KNK).
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION by Juanel Anthony Mikulak (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/11/2019 (KMH).
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED LETTER re: IFP Application by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. (Attachments: #1 IFP, #2 Exhibit - Data Request Form, #3 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/2/2019 (KMH).
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion for Continuance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/23/2019. (JRE) Modified text on 4/23/2019 (kt). cc: Mikulak on 4/25/2019 (KNK).
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Juanel Anthony Mikulak re #8 Meet and Confer Statement, #5 MOTION for Continuance, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(kt) Document QC'd on 5/7/2019 (MKB).
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion for Continuance filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak.(kt) Document QC'd on 5/7/2019 (MKB).
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Continuance filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak.(kt) Document QC'd on 5/7/2019 (MKB).
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Continuance : Date and time to be determined. (kt) Document QC'd on 5/7/2019 (MKB).
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Continuance filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 5/7/2019 (MKB).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/18/2019. (HAM) cc: Mikulak on 4/20/2019 (KNK).
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, by Juanel Mikulak. (MMP)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. (MMP)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Holly Ann Perkins, Jeff Richardson, Samantha Mae Seyl Richardson filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Envelope) cc: Mikulak. (MMP) Modified text on 3/21/2019 (CLK). EXHIBITS RESTRICTED PER PRO SE LAW CLERK.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mikulak v. Seyl Richardson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Ann Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Mae Seyl Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanel Anthony Mikulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?