Boitnott v. Inspire Brands, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Defendant: Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc., Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc. and Inspire Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00789
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 19 JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(JME)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 5/14/2019. (RJE)
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jerald Boitnott. Jointly Signed by Inspire Brands, Inc., Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc., and Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc.. (Carlson, Ronald)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/13/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brett Eric Coburn for Inspire Brands, Inc.; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles Herrick Morgan for Inspire Brands, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/18/2019. (NAH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles H. Morgan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6816811 filed by Inspire Brands, Inc.. (Beck, Alec)
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brett E. Coburn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6816791 filed by Inspire Brands, Inc.. (Beck, Alec)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ronald Bruce Carlson for Jerald Boitnott; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kelly Iverson for Jerald Boitnott. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/16/2019. (NAH)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelly K. Iverson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6812389 filed by Jerald Boitnott. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney R. Bruce Carlson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6812365 filed by Jerald Boitnott. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. ARG Investment Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Inspire Brands, Inc.. (Beck, Alec)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Inspire Brands, Inc.. (Beck, Alec)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerald Boitnott. Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc. served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerald Boitnott. Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc. served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerald Boitnott. Inspire Brands, Inc. served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
March 22, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc., Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc., Inspire Brands, Inc.. (MMG)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations & ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-789 WMW/HB. (MMG)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc., Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc., Inspire Brands, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6749831) filed by Jerald Boitnott. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Michenfelder, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boitnott v. Inspire Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspire Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Eric Coburn
Represented By: Charles Herrick Morgan
Represented By: Alec J Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Ronald Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Kelly Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?