United States of America v. $37,339 iN U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $37,339 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 0:2019cv00821
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #12 Stipulation. The deadline under 18 U.S.C. 983(a)(4)(A) and Rule G(5)(a)(ii), Supplemental Rules For Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions, for filing a verified claim in response to the Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem in this matter is extended until July 31, 2019 with respect to Cam Nguyen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/25/2019. (TMA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Baune, Craig)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO FILE VERIFIED CLAIM (Third) by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Cam Nguyen. (Baune, Craig)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #8 Stipulation.The deadline under 18 U.S.C. 983(a)(4)(A) and Rule G(5)(a)(ii), Supplemental Rules For Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions, for filing a verified claim in response to the Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem in this matter is extended until June 21, 2019 with respect to Cam Nguyen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 5/24/2019. (TMA)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #8 Stipulation, #9 Proposed Order to Judge (Baune, Craig)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Baune, Craig)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend the Time to File Verified Claim (Second) by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Cam Nguyen. (Baune, Craig)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #4 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 5/7/2019. (TMA)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #4 Stipulation, #5 Proposed Order to Judge (Baune, Craig)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation. (Baune, Craig)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO FILE VERIFIED CLAIM by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Cam Nguyen. (Baune, Craig)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $37,339 USC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KNK) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/1/2019 (KMH).
March 26, 2019 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-821 PJS/ECW. (CLK)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $37,339 IN U.S. CURRENCY filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $37,339 iN U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $37,339 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?