Guzman Cruz et al v. Supermercado Lomabonita Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gregorio Salazar Rodriguez, Crispin Guzman Cruz, Orlando Rodriguez Perez and John/Jane Doe (1-20)
Defendant: Tomas Castillo, Supermercado Lomabonita Inc., Gregorio Castillo Herrera, Panaderia Lomabonita 3 Inc., Supermercado Lomabonita #4 Inc., Gregorio Castillo Hernandez, Panaderia Lomabonita INC, Supermercado Lomabonita 3 Inc., Fernando Castillo and Porfirio Castillo
Case Number: 0:2019cv00980
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/11/2019. (HAM)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2019. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2019. Expert Discovery due by 4/15/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 12/31/2019. Motions (disp) due by 6/15/2020. Ready for trial due by 10/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/11/2019. (HAM)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/11/2019. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #9 Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/21/2019. (JRE)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation,. (Martinez-Aleman, Inti)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Fernando Castillo, Porfirio Castillo, Tomas Castillo, Gregorio Castillo Hernandez, Gregorio Castillo Herrera, Panaderia Lomabonita 3 Inc., Panaderia Lomabonita INC, Supermercado Lomabonita #4 Inc., Supermercado Lomabonita 3 Inc., Supermercado Lomabonita Inc.. (Martinez-Aleman, Inti)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Fernando Castillo, Porfirio Castillo, Tomas Castillo, Gregorio Castillo Hernandez, Gregorio Castillo Herrera, Panaderia Lomabonita 3 Inc., Panaderia Lomabonita INC, Supermercado Lomabonita #4 Inc., Supermercado Lomabonita 3 Inc., Supermercado Lomabonita Inc. DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE (Attachments: #1 Stipulation for protective order)(Martinez-Aleman, Inti) Modified text on 5/17/2019 (MMP).
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Counterclaim of Defendant Supermercado Lomabonita #4 Inc. filed by Crispin Guzman Cruz, Orlando Rodriguez Perez, Gregorio Salazar Rodriguez. (Gavigan, Michael)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Crispin Guzman Cruz, Orlando Rodriguez Perez, Gregorio Salazar Rodriguez. filed by Panaderia Lomabonita INC, Tomas Castillo, Panaderia Lomabonita 3 Inc., Supermercado Lomabonita #4 Inc., Porfirio Castillo, Gregorio Castillo Hernandez, Supermercado Lomabonita 3 Inc., Fernando Castillo, Gregorio Castillo Herrera, Supermercado Lomabonita Inc.. (Martinez-Aleman, Inti)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Gregorio Castillo Hernandez re #1 Notice of Removal, (Martinez-Aleman, Inti) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (MMP).
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregorio Castillo Hernandez re #1 Notice of Removal, (Martinez-Aleman, Inti)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-980 NEB/TNL. (MMG)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-CV-19-2232 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6795631) filed by Gregorio Castillo Hernandez. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Notice of consent to removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martinez-Aleman, Inti) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman Cruz et al v. Supermercado Lomabonita Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregorio Salazar Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael D Gavigan
Represented By: Matthew P Lawlyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crispin Guzman Cruz
Represented By: Michael D Gavigan
Represented By: Matthew P Lawlyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Rodriguez Perez
Represented By: Michael D Gavigan
Represented By: Matthew P Lawlyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John/Jane Doe (1-20)
Represented By: Michael D Gavigan
Represented By: Matthew P Lawlyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomas Castillo
Represented By: Inti Martinez-Aleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supermercado Lomabonita Inc.
Represented By: Inti Martinez-Aleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregorio Castillo Herrera
Represented By: Inti Martinez-Aleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panaderia Lomabonita 3 Inc.
Represented By: Inti Martinez-Aleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supermercado Lomabonita #4 Inc.
Represented By: Inti Martinez-Aleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregorio Castillo Hernandez
Represented By: Inti Martinez-Aleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panaderia Lomabonita INC
Represented By: Inti Martinez-Aleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supermercado Lomabonita 3 Inc.
Represented By: Inti Martinez-Aleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Castillo
Represented By: Inti Martinez-Aleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porfirio Castillo
Represented By: Inti Martinez-Aleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?