Campbell v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kathleen Campbell
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv00984
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company answer due 7/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/6/2019. (MSK)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Lincoln National Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Hoffmann, Kathleen)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Hoffmann, Kathleen)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Kathleen Campbell. (Hoffmann, Kathleen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kathleen Campbell. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Operana, Brandon)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 4/16/2019. (CLB)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (MMP)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-984 (DSD/BRT). (MMP)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6797418) filed by Kathleen Campbell. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Operana, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Campbell
Represented By: Brandon Operana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?