Lindsay et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Boughton, Jeremy Borras, Corey Quebedeaux, Guy Goudeau, Jeremy Lindsay, Trevor Ray, Roger Reed, Christopher Gowens, Timothy Strickland, Alan Cripps, Justin Mabry, Ronnie Scott, Joshua Falgout, Daniel Wilson, Brad Fairish, Jamie Skinner, Ryan Miracle, Henry Smith, David Dauzat, Antonio Bradford, Troy Gray, Colby Callaway, Kelvin Buster, Sr, Kristopher Norris, Hunter Pullen and Curtis Graham
Defendant: 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv00994
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 (Text-Only) NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Florida. (JAT)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-only) ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Pursuant to the parties Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these proceedings are stayed in their entirety until such time as the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this matter will be transferred to MDL No. 2555, pending in the Northern District of Florida before the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 4/23/2019. (MME)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Hulse, Benjamin)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Jeremy Lindsay, et al. and Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-994 (NEB/SER). (MMP)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-19-4686 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6798556) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Summons Issued to 3M, #3 Exhibit(s) Summons Issued to Aearo Technologies LLC, #4 Exhibit(s) Order companioning cases, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 4/10/2019 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsay et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Boughton
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Borras
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Quebedeaux
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Goudeau
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Lindsay
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Ray
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Reed
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gowens
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Strickland
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Cripps
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Mabry
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Scott
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Falgout
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Wilson
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Fairish
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Skinner
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Miracle
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Smith
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dauzat
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Bradford
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Gray
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colby Callaway
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Buster, Sr
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Norris
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Pullen
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Graham
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Jerry W Blackwell
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?