K.R. et al v. Duluth Public Schools Academy
Plaintiff: G.H., K.R., P.K. and L.G.
Defendant: Duluth Public Schools Academy
Case Number: 0:2019cv00999
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Duluth Public Schools Academy. (Skelton, Margaret)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on #14 Stipulation - Duluth Public Schools Academy answer due 7/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/17/2019. (JLB)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation,. (Skelton, Margaret)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer First Amended Complaint by Duluth Public Schools Academy. Jointly Signed by K.R., a minor, by and through his parent and natural guardian, Kali Proctor, G.H., a minor, by and through her parent and natural guardian, Katelyn Hansen, P.K., a minor, by and through his parent and natural guardian, Roynetter Birgans, and L.G., a minor, by and through her parent and natural guardian, Desmond Gilbert. (Skelton, Margaret)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adele P. Kimmel for G.H., K.R., L.G., and for P.K.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/13/2019. (NAH)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Duluth Public Schools Academy. filed by K.R., P.K., G.H.. No summons requested. (Bailey, Rebekah)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adele P. Kimmel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6931903 filed by G.H., K.R., P.K.. (Bailey, Rebekah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Duluth Public Schools Academy. (Skelton, Margaret)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.R., P.K., G.H.. Duluth Public Schools Academy served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Kaster, Lucas)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas J Kaster on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kaster, Lucas)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A Sullivan on behalf of Duluth Public Schools Academy. (Sullivan, Timothy)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on #4 Stipulation - Duluth Public Schools Academy answer due 5/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/24/2019. (VLM)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation,. (Skelton, Margaret)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Duluth Public Schools Academy. Jointly Signed by K.R., a minor, by and through his parent and natural guardian, Kali Proctor, G.H., a minor, by and through her parent and natural guardian, Katelyn Hansen, and P.K., a minor, by and through his parent and natural guardian, Roynetter Birgans. (Skelton, Margaret)
April 15, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Duluth Public Schools Academy. (CLK)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (5th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-CV-999 DWF/LIB. (CLK)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Duluth Public Schools Academy (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6799597) filed by K.R., P.K., G.H.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bailey, Rebekah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.R. et al v. Duluth Public Schools Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.H.
Represented By: Rebekah L Bailey
Represented By: Adele P. Kimmel
Represented By: Robert L Schug
Represented By: Charles A Delbridge
Represented By: Matthew H Morgan
Represented By: Lucas J Kaster
Represented By: Anna P Prakash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.R.
Represented By: Rebekah L Bailey
Represented By: Adele P. Kimmel
Represented By: Robert L Schug
Represented By: Charles A Delbridge
Represented By: Matthew H Morgan
Represented By: Lucas J Kaster
Represented By: Anna P Prakash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.K.
Represented By: Rebekah L Bailey
Represented By: Adele P. Kimmel
Represented By: Robert L Schug
Represented By: Charles A Delbridge
Represented By: Matthew H Morgan
Represented By: Lucas J Kaster
Represented By: Anna P Prakash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.G.
Represented By: Adele P. Kimmel
Represented By: Robert L Schug
Represented By: Charles A Delbridge
Represented By: Rebekah L Bailey
Represented By: Matthew H Morgan
Represented By: Lucas J Kaster
Represented By: Anna P Prakash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duluth Public Schools Academy
Represented By: Margaret A Skelton
Represented By: Timothy A Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?