Taylor v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Tereasa Taylor
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 0:2019cv01016
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Life Insurance Company of North America is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Connecticut General Corporation, which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Cigna Holdings, Inc., which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Cigna Holding Company, which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Cigna Corporation, a publicly traded company.(Santos, Margaret) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (LPH).
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/29/2019. (NAH)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 4/15/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Santos, Margaret)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6836928 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (JLB)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1016 (SRN/TNL). (JLB)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6804154) filed by Tereasa Taylor. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schmoll, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tereasa Taylor
Represented By: Zachary Schmoll
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Alexander M Baggio
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?