Rice v. Twin Cities Automotive LLC

Plaintiff: Michelle Rice
Defendant: Twin Cities Automotive LLC d/b/a Carousel Motor Group d/b/a Audi-St. Paul and Twin Cities Automotive LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01141
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Ann D Montgomery
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2019. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2019. Expert Discovery due by 3/20/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 12/31/2019. Motions (disp) due by 2/24/2020. Ready for trial due by 5/1/2020. See the order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/7/2019. (JMK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/6/2019. A written Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (JMK) Modified date/text on 6/7/2019 (lmb).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/3/2019. (JMK)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Simonet, Kristin)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Twin Cities Automotive LLC. Jointly Signed by Michelle Rice. (Simonet, Kristin)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Twin Cities Automotive LLC. Jointly Signed by Michelle Rice.(Simonet, Kristin)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/30/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Twin Cities Automotive LLC. (Simonet, Kristin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Blades, Cody)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules.(JMK)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1141 (ADM/HB). (KNK) Modified text on 5/2/2019 (KNK).
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Twin Cities Automotive LLC d/b/a Carousel Motor Group d/b/a Audi-St. Paul re #1 Notice of Removal, (Simonet, Kristin)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Starquest Automotive, LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Twin Cities Automotive LLC d/b/a Carousel Motor Group d/b/a Audi-St. Paul. (Simonet, Kristin)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-cv-19-3083 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6839434) filed by Twin Cities Automotive LLC No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Simonet, Kristin) Modified text on 4/30/2019 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Twin Cities Automotive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Rice
Represented By: J Ashwin Madia
Represented By: Cody Blades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Cities Automotive LLC d/b/a Carousel Motor Group d/b/a Audi-St. Paul
Represented By: Kristin Simonet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Cities Automotive LLC
Represented By: Gregory J Stenmoe
Represented By: Kristin Simonet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?