Munt v. Schnell et al

Plaintiff: Joel Marvin Munt
Defendant: Graham Besonen, Witter, Sherlinda Wheeler, Parker, David Reishus, Lindsey Mosser, Paul Schnell, Bronson Austreng and Nick Desetelle
Case Number: 0:2019cv01142
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION re #9 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Joel Marvin Munt. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(KDS)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #7 Objection: scanned envelope back (KMH)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/12/2019. cc: Munt. (TMA) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (CLK).
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Accept Supplement filed by Joel Marvin Munt. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, DOCUMENT ATTACHED IN ERROR. WRONG CASE #2 Envelope)(JLB) Modified text on 5/26/2019 (CLK). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2019: #3 Envelope) (JLB). Document QC'd by KMH on 6/19/2019 (KMH).
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION re #4 Order/Notice to Attorney by Joel Marvin Munt. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(LPH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: #3 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 6/18/2019 (KMH.
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIPT number 44641103250 in the amount of $24.01 issued to Joel Munt. (JLB) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/17/2019 (KMH).
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Officials Re: Financial Obligation of Joel Marvin Munt. (CLK)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 5/13/2019. cc: Munt, Minnesota Attorney General, Minnesota Dept of Corrections. (TMA) Modified text on 5/14/2019 (CLK).
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Joel Munt. (JLB) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/1/2019 (KMH).
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joel Marvin Munt. (JLB) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/1/2019 (KMH).
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Bronson Austreng, Graham Besonen, Nick Desetelle, Lindsey Mosser, Parker, David Reishus, Paul Schnell, Sherlinda Wheeler, Witter filed by Joel Marvin Munt. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JLB) cc: NEF to Munt (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2019: #4 Scanned Envelope Back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 5/1/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munt v. Schnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Besonen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Witter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherlinda Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Reishus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Mosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Schnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bronson Austreng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Desetelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Marvin Munt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?