United States of America v. $27,102 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $27,102 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 0:2019cv01167
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of PUBLICATION by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Baune, Craig)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT Returned 5/14/2019 as to $27,102 USC. (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest and Notice of In Rem)(KNK) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/14/2019 (KMH).
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM ISSUED. (KNK)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1167 (NEB/BRT). (KNK)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against United States of America filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $27,102 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $27,102 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?