Cook v. Madison National Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Ashley Cook
Defendant: Madison National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01180
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Madison National Life Insurance Company. filed by Ashley Cook. No summons requested. (Klotzbuecher, Mark)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ashley Cook. Madison National Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/3/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Klotzbuecher, Mark)
May 3, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Madison National Life Insurance Company. (MMG)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 5th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-1180 WMW/LIB. (MMG)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Madison National Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6847426) filed by Ashley Cook. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klotzbuecher, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Madison National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Cook
Represented By: Mark Klotzbuecher
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?