Johnson v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The

Plaintiff: Lorraine Johnson
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 0:2019cv01182
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Margaret A. Falck as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until and including August 1, 2019 to file an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/1/2019. (HAM)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Extension to Answer #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Klotzbuecher, Mark)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Lorraine Johnson. (Klotzbuecher, Mark)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lorraine Johnson. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Klotzbuecher, Mark)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (JLB)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1182 (MJD/TNL). (JLB)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6847592) filed by Lorraine Johnson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klotzbuecher, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Johnson
Represented By: Mark Klotzbuecher
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?