Schleicher et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Barbara Schleicher and Richard Schleicher
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Companies and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01184
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/NOTICE: AMENDED ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 1/14/2020. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 1/7/2020. Settlement Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/27/2019. (MSK)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST re #15 Order/Notice of Setting/Resetting Hearings/Deadlines, by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Angell, Christopher)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER/NOTICE: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 12/5/2019. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 12/2/2019. Settlement Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/10/2019. (MSK)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 9/3/2019. Fact Discovery due by 1/2/2020. Expert Discovery due by 4/1/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 9/3/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 1/2/2020. Motions (disp) due by 6/1/2020. Ready for trial due by 10/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/7/2019. (MSK) Modified signature date/text on 6/10/2019 (lmb).
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/7/2019. (MSK)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation to Amend Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/31/2019. (MSK)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Angell, Christopher)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Stipulation to Amend Caption by State Farm Insurance Companies. (Angell, Christopher)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by State Farm Insurance Companies. Jointly signed by plaintiffs. (Angell, Christopher) Modified text on 5/31/2019 (MMG).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/8/2019. (CLB)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1184 (DSD/BRT). (MMP)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal, Affidavit of Service of Answer, Notice of Removal, etc. byState Farm Insurance Companies. (Angell, Christopher)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant State Farm Insurance Companies. (Angell, Christopher)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Insurance Companies. (Angell, Christopher)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by State Farm Insurance Companies. (Angell, Christopher)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anoka County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6848481) filed by State Farm Insurance Companies. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Angell, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schleicher et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Companies
Represented By: Christopher G Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher G Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Schleicher
Represented By: Christopher J Hoffer
Represented By: Sara E Nachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Schleicher
Represented By: Christopher J Hoffer
Represented By: Sara E Nachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?