Sowers v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Joshua Sowers
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01193
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sara G Janes. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6971050 filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Huhta, Adam)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Donald A Murday. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6971042 filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Huhta, Adam)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S Huhta on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Huhta, Adam)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joshua Sowers. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Williams, Merrick)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/7/2019. (CLB)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (CLK)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1193 DSD/DTS. (CLK)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6850730) filed by Joshua Sowers. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Merrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sowers v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam S Huhta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Sowers
Represented By: Merrick B Williams
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?