Rocheleau v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Andrea Rocheleau
Defendant: Cigna and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 0:2019cv01221
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING Cigna. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 5/17/2019. (RMM)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Santos, Margaret)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT CIGNA by Cigna, Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Andrea Rocheleau. (Santos, Margaret)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Cigna and for Life Insurance Company of North America. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/9/2019. (NAH)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America, Cigna. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 5/1/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Santos, Margaret)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America, Cigna. Cigna waiver sent on 5/1/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Santos, Margaret)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6860882 filed by Cigna, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1221 (ECT/HB). (KNK)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Scott District Cout (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6857686) filed by Life Insurance Company of North America, Cigna. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit of Service) (Santos, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocheleau v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Rocheleau
Represented By: Benjamin L Reitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: Alexander M Baggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: Alexander M Baggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?