Brown v. USA
Petitioner: Johnny Martell Brown
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 0:2019cv01229
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT. cc: Johnny Martell Brown with Appeal Packet (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(lmb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation [Docket No. #8 ]. Brown's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 [Docket No. #1 ] is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 6/28/2019. (CBC) cc: Johnny Martell Brown. Modified text on 7/1/2019 (lmb).
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Johnny Martell Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/3/2019. (SGK)cc: Johnny Martell Brown. Modified text on 6/3/2019 (MMP).
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA re #5 Response, #6 Declaration (Tweeten, Andrew)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Shannon Boldt re #5 Response by USA . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Tweeten, Andrew)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by USA.(Tweeten, Andrew)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) to file answer within 7 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 5/14/2019. (TMA) cc: Brown on 5/15/2019 (KNK).
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of USA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tweeten, Andrew)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Johnny Martell Brown. (MMG)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Johnny Martell Brown. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) cc:Brown (MMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnny Martell Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?