Bryant v. Argonaut Food Partners, LLC

Plaintiff: David Bryant
Defendant: Argonaut Food Partners, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01231
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by William French. (MMP)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Argonaut Food Partners, LLC Update re Order of May 24, 2019 (Dkt. No. 5). (Tanick, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER in Response to #3 Letter to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/24/2019. (EB)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Amended ANSWER to Complaint filed by Argonaut Food Partners, LLC. (Tanick, Andrew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Argonaut Food Partners, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) In Re French, Minnesota Supreme Court File No. A18-1648 (April 8, 2019))(Tanick, Andrew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1231 (NEB/TNL). (KNK)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6860918) filed by Argonaut Food Partners, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Answer, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service) (Hoffmann, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Argonaut Food Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argonaut Food Partners, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hoffmann
Represented By: Andrew E Tanick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bryant
Represented By: William L French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?