Dizon et al v. Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Efrensino Lacanilao Dizon and Carmen Balverde Dizon
Defendant: Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01233
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED Rule 26(f) Report Planning Meeting filed by Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company.(Tupa, Brendan) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (MMP).
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/18/2019. Parties are ORDERED to file an Amended Rule 26(f) Report and email an Amended Rule 26(f) Worksheet within 7 days. (MME)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company.(Tupa, Brendan)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report, Rule 26 Worksheet, and confidential settlement letters due by 6/11/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 11:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MME)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Defendant Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company, actually known as LM General Insurance Company,discloses that it is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. has no parent corporations and no publicly held company owns 10% or more of its stock. (Tupa, Brendan) Modified text on 5/10/2019 (MMP).
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1233 JNE/SER. (CLK)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company. (Tupa, Brendan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County, case number 82-CV-19-2204 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6861719) filed by Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tupa, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dizon et al v. Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efrensino Lacanilao Dizon
Represented By: Michael B Padden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Balverde Dizon
Represented By: Michael B Padden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual General Insurance Company
Represented By: Brendan R Tupa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?