Thrune v. Group Long Term Disability Insurance for Employees of Merchants Financial Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gregory G. Thrune and Gregory Thrune
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Merchants Financial Group, Inc., Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The, Group Life, Dependent Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent AD&D Insurance for Employees of Merchants Financial Group, Inc. and Group Long Term Disability Insurance for Employees of Merchants Financial Group, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01319
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company answer due 7/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/24/2019. (MSK)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Margaret A. Falck as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Comapny, The. filed by Gregory Thrune. No summons requested. (Niesen, Andrea)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION by Gregory Thrune. Jointly Signed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Niesen, Andrea)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Thrune , SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Thrune. Lincoln National Life Insurance Comapny, The served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Niesen, Andrea)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Group Life, Dependent Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent AD&D Insurance for Employees of Merchants Financial Group, Inc., Group Longterm Disability Insurance for Employees of Merchants Financial Group, Inc., Lincoln National Life Insurance Comapny, The. (MMG)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1319 NEB/BRT. (MMG)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint. (Niesen, Andrea)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6885170) filed by Gregory G. Thrune. Filer requests summons issued. (Niesen, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrune v. Group Long Term Disability Insurance for Employees of Merchants Financial Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Life, Dependent Life, Accidental Death and Dismemberment and Dependent AD&D Insurance for Employees of Merchants Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Insurance for Employees of Merchants Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory G. Thrune
Represented By: Andrea B Niesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Thrune
Represented By: Andrea B Niesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?