Comstock v. Frito-Lay, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jason Comstock
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc. and Frito-Lay, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01321
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2019. (MSK)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER/NOTICE: AMENDED ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 2/7/2020. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 1/31/2020. Settlement Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2019. (MSK)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER/NOTICE: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 2/4/2020. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 1/30/2020. Settlement Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2019. (MSK)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2019. Fact Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 4/1/2020. Motions (disp) due by 8/3/2020. Ready for trial due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2019. (MSK)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/11/2019. (MSK)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation. (McEllistrem, Sarah)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Jason Comstock. (McEllistrem, Sarah)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Jason Comstock. Jointly Signed by Kristina Kaluza and Anthony Gabor.(McEllistrem, Sarah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Lindquist, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 6/18/2019. (CLB)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Raymond Alan Cowley for Frito-Lay, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/4/2019. (JGK)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 Hy-Vee, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Lindquist, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. PepsiCo, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Frito-Lay, Inc.. PepsiCo, Inc. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Raymond A. Cowley as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Raymond A. Cowley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6887642 filed by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd 4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1321 (DSD/BRT). (MMP)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frito-Lay, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Kaluza, Kristina)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Olmsted County, case number 55-cv-19-3051 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6886115) filed by Frito-Lay, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Hy-Vee Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Notice of Filing of Removal to Federal Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kaluza, Kristina) Modified text on 5/20/2019 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comstock v. Frito-Lay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Comstock
Represented By: Sarah J McEllistrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey J Lindquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito-Lay, Inc.
Represented By: Kristina Kaluza
Represented By: Raymond Alan Cowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?