Hari v. Stuart et al
Plaintiff: Michael B. Hari
Defendant: Deputy J. Maro, James Stuart and CPL Mingo
Case Number: 0:2019cv01330
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #8 Exhibit List: scanned envelope back. (KMH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Kevin George Washington filed by Michael B. Hari. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG)
July 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #4 Letter: Scanned envelope back (KMH)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIPT number 44641103679 in the amount of $120.19 issued to Michael Hari. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/10/2019 (KMH).
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Exhibit List by Michael B. Hari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-10, #2 Envelope)(MMG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2019: #3 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 7/12/2019 (KMH).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michael B. Hari. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/18/2019. (HAM) cc: Hari on 6/19/2019 (KNK).
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Anthony Akeum Abari by Michael B. Hari. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/27/2019 (KMH).
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER to the Court filed by Michael B. Hari (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MMG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #3 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 6/27/2019 (KMH).
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER to the Court filed by Michael B. Hari (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(MMG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #3 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/29/2019. (HAM) cc: Michael B. Hari. Modified text on 5/29/2019 (MMP).
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michael B. Hari. (LPH) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/14/2019 (KMH).
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against J. Maro, Mingo, James Stuart filed by Michael B. Hari. Case assigned to Judge Erid C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (LPH) cc: Plf Document QC'd by KMH on 6/14/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hari v. Stuart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy J. Maro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPL Mingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Hari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?