Gilo v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Gilo Otor Gilo
Respondent: Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan, William P. Barr, Peter Berg and Eric Hollien
Case Number: 0:2019cv01339
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT UPDATE Duplicate of #10 MOTION /Request declaratory and injunctive relief by Gilo Otor Gilo (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(MMG)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT re #10 MOTION /Request declaratory and injunctive relief filed by Gilo Otor Gilo.(MMG)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION /Request declaratory and injunctive relief filed by Gilo Otor Gilo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/10/2019. (TJB) cc: Gilo Otor Gilo. Modified text on 7/10/2019 (MMP).
June 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: rescanned Exhibit A to include all pages. (KMH)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan re #6 Response to Habeas Petition, #7 Declaration,, (Marentette, Pamela)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Timothy J. McPherson re #6 Response to Habeas Petition by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Marentette, Pamela)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan. (Marentette, Pamela)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Marentette on behalf of William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marentette, Pamela)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE. NOTICE of Appearance by Ana H Voss on behalf of William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Voss, Ana) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (JLB).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) to file answer within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 5/29/2019. (TJB). cc: Gilo on 5/30/2019 (KNK).
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Gilo Otor Gilo. (LPH) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/18/2019 (KMH).
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gilo Otor Gilo. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope) (LPH) cc: Gilo (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: #4 Rescanned Exhibit A) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 6/18/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilo v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Homan
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Pamela Marentette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Pamela Marentette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Pamela Marentette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Berg
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Pamela Marentette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Hollien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gilo Otor Gilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?