Carter v. Marques
Petitioner: Jermaine Carter
Respondent: R. Marques
Case Number: 0:2019cv01403
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jermaine Carter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/1/2019. (JLB) cc: Jermaine Carter. Modified text on 7/2/2019 (MMP).
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of R. Marques. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tweeten, Andrew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jermaine Carter re #2 Memorandum, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LPH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #2 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 6/19/2019 (KMH).
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jermaine Carter.(LPH) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/19/2019 (KMH).
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 400103222) filed by Jermaine Carter. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter) (LPH) cc: Carter Document QC'd by KMH on 6/19/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Marques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jermaine Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Marques
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?