Van Saders et al v. Franchoice, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Van Saders, Jamie Van Saders and BBJSC, Inc.
Defendant: Franchoice, Inc. and Scott Jones
Case Number: 0:2019cv01414
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
2 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
3 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 Reply to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Scott Jones. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Miller-Van Oort, Sonia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot R Ginsburg on behalf of BBJSC, Inc., Jamie Van Saders, Stephen Van Saders. (Ginsburg, Elliot)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by BBJSC, Inc., Jamie Van Saders, Stephen Van Saders. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Garner, W)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Scott Jones to Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/2/2019. (GRR)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 Declaration of Ryan O. Vettleson in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Scott Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Miller-Van Oort, Sonia)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Scott Jones.(Miller-Van Oort, Sonia)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Franchoice, Inc., Scott Jones.(Miller-Van Oort, Sonia)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Scott Jones. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Miller-Van Oort, Sonia)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) : Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Miller-Van Oort, Sonia)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Scott Jones. (Miller-Van Oort, Sonia)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. 1.Defendants time to respond to the Complaint is extended until June 28, 2019, which is then the deadline for Defendants initial dispositive briefing; 2.Plaintiffs responsive briefing shall be due on July 12, 2019; and 3.Defendants reply brief is due on July 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/13/2019. (TMA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Franchoice, Inc., Scott Jones. Jointly Signed by Stephen Van Saders, Jamie Van Saders, BBJSC, FranChoice, Inc., and Scott Jones. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan O Vettleson on behalf of Franchoice, Inc., Scott Jones. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Van Saders, BBJSC, Inc., Jamie Van Saders. Scott Jones served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Garner, W)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright for all further proceedings. Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1414 MJD/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings.Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Judge David S. Doty on 6/6/2019. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 6/7/2019.(MMG)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Van Saders, BBJSC, Inc., Jamie Van Saders. Franchoice, Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Garner, W)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Franchoice, Inc., Scott Jones. (MMP)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1414 (ECT/BRT). (MMP)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Franchoice, Inc., Scott Jones (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6902485) filed by Stephen Van Saders, BBJSC, Inc., Jamie Van Saders. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR - #1 Summons ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR - #2 Summons #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Garner, W) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Saders et al v. Franchoice, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Van Saders
Represented By: W Michael Garner
Represented By: Erin C. Johnsen
Represented By: Elliot R Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Van Saders
Represented By: W Michael Garner
Represented By: Erin C. Johnsen
Represented By: Elliot R Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBJSC, Inc.
Represented By: W Michael Garner
Represented By: Erin C. Johnsen
Represented By: Elliot R Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franchoice, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan O Vettleson
Represented By: Sonia L Miller-Van Oort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Represented By: Ryan O Vettleson
Represented By: Sonia L Miller-Van Oort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?