Johnson et al v. Franchoice, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson and Strong Life LLC
Defendant: Franchoice, Inc. and Chris Cynkar
Case Number: 0:2019cv01417
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 Reply to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Chris Cynkar, Franchoice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Miller-Van Oort, Sonia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot R Ginsburg on behalf of Michael Johnson, Strong Life LLC. (Ginsburg, Elliot)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Michael Johnson, Strong Life LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Garner, W)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Chris Cynkar to Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/2/2019. (GRR)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Chris Cynkar, Franchoice, Inc..(Vettleson, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Chris Cynkar, Franchoice, Inc..(Vettleson, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Chris Cynkar, Franchoice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Vettleson, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Chris Cynkar, Franchoice, Inc.. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. 1.Defendants time to respond to the complaint is extended until June 28, 2019, which is also the deadline for Defendants initial dispositive briefing; 2.Plaintiffs responsive briefing shall be due on July 12, 2019; and 3.Defendants reply brief is due on July 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/20/2019. (TMA)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Chris Cynkar, Franchoice, Inc.. Jointly Signed by FranChoice, Inc., Chris Cynkar, Michael Johnson, and Strong Life LLC. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan O Vettleson on behalf of Chris Cynkar, Franchoice, Inc.. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Johnson, Strong Life LLC. Chris Cynkar served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Garner, W)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright for all further proceedings. Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1417 MJD/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Judge David S. Doty on 6/6/2019. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 6/7/2019.(MMG)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Johnson, Strong Life LLC. Franchoice, Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Garner, W)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chris Cynkar, Franchoice, Inc.. (KNK)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1417 (ECT/TNL). (KNK)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris Cynkar, Franchoice, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6903166) filed by Michael Johnson, Strong Life LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EX. 1 to Complaint, #2 ATTACHED IN ERROR - Summons - Franchoice, #3 ATTACHED IN ERROR - Summons - Cynkar, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Garner, W) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (JLB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Franchoice, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Represented By: W Michael Garner
Represented By: Erin C. Johnsen
Represented By: Elliot R Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strong Life LLC
Represented By: W Michael Garner
Represented By: Erin C. Johnsen
Represented By: Elliot R Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franchoice, Inc.
Represented By: Sonia L Miller-Van Oort
Represented By: Ryan O Vettleson
Represented By: Robin M Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Cynkar
Represented By: Sonia L Miller-Van Oort
Represented By: Ryan O Vettleson
Represented By: Robin M Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?