United States of America v. $34,385 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $34,385 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Sou Sinh Saelee
Case Number: 0:2019cv01420
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. This civil forfeiture action is stayed until the related criminal investigation is resolved or pending further order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/18/2019. (MME)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Hudleston, Sarah)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Sou Sinh Saelee. (Hudleston, Sarah)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Max A Keller on behalf of Sou Sinh Saelee. (Keller, Max)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 VERIFIED CLAIM filed by Sou Sinh Saelee. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Keller, Max) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (MMP).
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $34,385 USC. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
May 31, 2019 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (MMG)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1420 PJS/SER. (MMG) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (MMG).
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $34,385 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hudleston, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $34,385 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $34,385 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah E. Hudleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sou Sinh Saelee
Represented By: Max A Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?