Hummel et al v. Minnesota Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Luis Miguel Hummel and 5th Sun Gardens, LLC
Defendant: Thom Petersen, Jane Doe, Doug Spanier, John Doe, Margaret Wiatrowski, Minnesota Department of Agriculture and Anthony Cortilet
Case Number: 0:2019cv01431
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Due to the pending Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 7), and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (ECF No. 17), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/22/2019. (JMK)
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Defendants re Motion #17 to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (O'Donovan, Colin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint : (Third Amended Notice) Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (O'Donovan, Colin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 21 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #17 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Anthony Cortilet, Minnesota Department of Agriculture, Thom Petersen, Doug Spanier, Margaret Wiatrowski.(O'Donovan, Colin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Anthony Cortilet, Minnesota Department of Agriculture, Thom Petersen, Doug Spanier, Margaret Wiatrowski.(O'Donovan, Colin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of Colin O'Donovan in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Anthony Cortilet, Minnesota Department of Agriculture, Thom Petersen, Doug Spanier, Margaret Wiatrowski.(O'Donovan, Colin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Anthony Cortilet, Minnesota Department of Agriculture, Thom Petersen, Doug Spanier, Margaret Wiatrowski. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Donovan, Colin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Anthony Cortilet, Minnesota Department of Agriculture, Thom Petersen, Doug Spanier, Margaret Wiatrowski. (O'Donovan, Colin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Anthony Cortilet, Jane Doe, John Doe, Luis Miguel Hummel, Minnesota Department of Agriculture, Thom Petersen, Doug Spanier, Margaret Wiatrowski. (MMG)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by 5th Sun Gardens, LLC, Luis Miguel Hummel. Filer requests summons issued. (Tarasek, Jason)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (O'Donovan, Colin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (O'Donovan, Colin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (O'Donovan, Colin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #7 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Minnesota Department of Agriculture.(O'Donovan, Colin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Minnesota Department of Agriculture.(O'Donovan, Colin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Colin O'Donovan in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Minnesota Department of Agriculture.(O'Donovan, Colin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Minnesota Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Donovan, Colin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Minnesota Department of Agriculture. (O'Donovan, Colin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin Patrick O'Donovan on behalf of Anthony Cortilet, Minnesota Department of Agriculture, Thom Petersen, Doug Spanier, Margaret Wiatrowski. (O'Donovan, Colin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by 5th Sun Gardens, LLC, Luis Miguel Hummel re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Doug Spanier Aff of service, #2 Affidavit of Service Margaret Wiatrowski Aff of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service MN Dept of Agriculture, #4 Affidavit of Service Thom Peterson Aff of Service)(Tarasek, Jason)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Anthony Cortilet, Minnesota Department of Agriculture, Thom Petersen, Doug Spanier, Margaret Wiatrowski. (MMP)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd & 4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1431 (PJS/HB). (MMP)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6905122) filed by Luis Miguel Hummel. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tarasek, Jason) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hummel et al v. Minnesota Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thom Petersen
Represented By: Colin Patrick O'Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Spanier
Represented By: Colin Patrick O'Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Wiatrowski
Represented By: Colin Patrick O'Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Colin Patrick O'Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Cortilet
Represented By: Colin Patrick O'Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Miguel Hummel
Represented By: Jason C Tarasek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5th Sun Gardens, LLC
Represented By: Jason C Tarasek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?