Mountain Peak Builders, LLC v. Tesoro Great Plains Gathering & Marketing LLC
Plaintiff: Mountain Peak Builders, LLC
Defendant: Tesoro Great Plains Gathering & Marketing LLC f/k/a Great Northern Gathering & Marketing, LLC and Tesoro Great Plains Gathering & Marketing LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01473
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 (Text-only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award: The Motion hearing scheduled for 9/25/19 on Plaintiff's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award has been stricken from the Court Calendar based on Plaintiff's voluntary dismissal of this case. (KMW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mountain Peak Builders, LLC (Hart, Kyle)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award : Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Sellers, Nathan)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mountain Peak Builders, LLC. Tesoro Great Plains Gathering & Marketing LLC served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hart, Kyle)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Tesoro Great Plains Gathering & Marketing LLC. (CLK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-1473 NEB/LIB. (CLK)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Mountain Peak Builders, LLC.(Sellers, Nathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Nathan R. Sellers in Support of #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Mountain Peak Builders, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4a, #5 Exhibit(s) 4b, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6)(Sellers, Nathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Mountain Peak Builders, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sellers, Nathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award : Date and time to be determined. (Sellers, Nathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Mountain Peak Builders, LLC. (Sellers, Nathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITIONfor Order Confirming Arbitration Award against Tesoro Great Plains Gathering & Marketing LLC f/k/a Great Northern Gathering & Marketing, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6919937) filed by Mountain Peak Builders, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sellers, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain Peak Builders, LLC v. Tesoro Great Plains Gathering & Marketing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Peak Builders, LLC
Represented By: Nathan R Sellers
Represented By: Kyle E Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Great Plains Gathering & Marketing LLC f/k/a Great Northern Gathering & Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Great Plains Gathering & Marketing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?