Dolphin Kickboxing Co. et al v. Franchoice, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Roger Gould and Dolphin Kickboxing Co.
Defendant: Franchoice, Inc. and Tana Hutchinson
Case Number: 0:2019cv01477
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
2 Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
3 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: Motion Hearing held on 8/2/2019 re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Tana Hutchinson. (TMA)
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 Reply to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Tana Hutchinson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Vettleson, Ryan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot R Ginsburg on behalf of Dolphin Kickboxing Co., Roger Gould. (Ginsburg, Elliot)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Dolphin Kickboxing Co., Roger Gould. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Garner, W)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Tana Hutchinson to Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/2/2019. (GRR)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Tana Hutchinson.(Vettleson, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Franchoice, Inc., Tana Hutchinson.(Vettleson, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Tana Hutchinson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Vettleson, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) : Notice of Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Franchoice, Inc., Tana Hutchinson. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation 1)Defendants time to respond to the Complaint is extended until June 28, 2019, which is also the deadline for Defendants initial dispositive briefing; 2)Plaintiffs responsive briefing shall be due on July 12, 2019; and3)Defendants reply brief is due on July 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/25/2019. (TMA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Franchoice, Inc.. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan O Vettleson on behalf of All Defendants. (Vettleson, Ryan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolphin Kickboxing Co., Roger Gould. Tana Hutchinson served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Garner, W)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolphin Kickboxing Co., Roger Gould. Franchoice, Inc. served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Garner, W)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1477 MJD/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Judge David S. Doty on 6/6/2019. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 6/7/2019.(MMG)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Franchoice, Inc., Tana Hutchinson. (KNK)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1477 (SRN/TNL). (KNK)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Franchoice, Inc., Tana Hutchinson (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6919924) filed by Dolphin Kickboxing Co., Roger Gould. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Garner, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolphin Kickboxing Co. et al v. Franchoice, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Gould
Represented By: W Michael Garner
Represented By: Erin C. Johnsen
Represented By: Elliot R Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolphin Kickboxing Co.
Represented By: W Michael Garner
Represented By: Erin C. Johnsen
Represented By: Elliot R Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franchoice, Inc.
Represented By: Sonia L Miller-Van Oort
Represented By: Ryan O Vettleson
Represented By: Robin M Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tana Hutchinson
Represented By: Sonia L Miller-Van Oort
Represented By: Ryan O Vettleson
Represented By: Robin M Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?