Kosmosky v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Ann Kosmosky
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 0:2019cv01478
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brewster S. Rawls for Ann Kosmosky; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Glen Howard Sturtevant, Jr for Ann Kosmosky. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/21/2019. (NAH)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Glen Sturtevant, Jr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6948335 filed by Ann Kosmosky. (Krause, Benjamin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brewster Rawls. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6948271 filed by Ann Kosmosky. (Krause, Benjamin)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 6/18/2019. (CLB)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ann Kosmosky Service Returned Executed (Krause, Benjamin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana H Voss on behalf of United States of America. (Voss, Ana)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (LPH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1478 DSD/HB. (LPH)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6919948) filed by Ann Kosmosky. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) FTCA SF 95, #3 Exhibit(s) Order Appointing Trustee) (Krause, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kosmosky v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Kosmosky
Represented By: Benjamin L Krause
Represented By: Glen Howard Sturtevant, Jr
Represented By: Brewster S. Rawls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?