Geimah v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Monue F. Geimah
Respondent: Peter Berg, Kurt Freitag, William P. Barr, Ronald Vitiello and Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 0:2019cv01479
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 EXHIBIT List re #16 Response filed by Monue F. Geimah.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(MMG)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Monue F. Geimah re #16 Response. (MMG)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Monue F. Geimah, re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Ronald Vitiello re #13 Declaration, #12 Response, #14 Declaration (Marentette, Pamela)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Pamela A. Marentette re #12 Response, by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Ronald Vitiello . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Marentette, Pamela)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Richard N. Pryd Jr. re #12 Response, by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Ronald Vitiello . (Marentette, Pamela)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #11 Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail,, filed by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Ronald Vitiello. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Marentette, Pamela)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER in Response to #8 Request, 1.The federal respondents shall file their answer, including a memorandum of law in response to the Petition and any accompanying affidavits and exhibits, on or before July 19, 2019. 2.If Monue G. intends to file a reply to respondents answer, he must do so within 30 days of the date when the answer is filed. Thereafter, no further submissions from either party will be permitted, except as authorized by Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/12/2019. (TMA) cc: Monue G. Modified text on 7/12/2019 (lmb).
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Ronald Vitiello re #9 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #8 Request, (Marentette, Pamela)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Request,. (Marentette, Pamela)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST re #6 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PETITION by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Ronald Vitiello. (Marentette, Pamela)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. IT IS ORDERED THAT the Government shall file a letter on CM/ECF within 21 days of any new filings, hearings, orders, or other activity in Petitioners related proceedings providing the Court with a status update as to such activity and attaching any orders or otherwise relevant documents as exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/1/2019. (TMA) cc: Geimah. Modified text on 7/1/2019 (lmb).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) to file answer within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/12/2019. (TMA) cc: Monue F. Geimah. Modified text on 6/13/2019 (MMP).
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Marentette on behalf of William P. Barr, Peter Berg. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marentette, Pamela)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED. NOTICE of Appearance by Ana H Voss on behalf of William P. Barr, Peter Berg. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Voss, Ana) Modified text on 6/7/2019 (KNK).
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monue F. Geimah re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Monue F. Geimah (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/28/2019 (KMH).
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Monue F. Geimah. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/28/2019 (KMH).
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Monue F. Geimah. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) cc:Monue F. Geimah (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/28/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geimah v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Berg
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Pamela Marentette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kurt Freitag
Represented By: David John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Pamela Marentette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Pamela Marentette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Pamela Marentette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Monue F. Geimah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?