Tafs v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Kathy Tafs
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01480
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 DEF ANSWER to Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Conlin, Patrick)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathy Tafs. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Balmer, James)
June 7, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.. (MMG)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 5th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-1480 WMW/LIB. (MMG)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6921237) filed by Kathy Tafs. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Balmer, James)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6920039) filed by Kathy Tafs. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Balmer, James) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tafs v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Represented By: Patrick M Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Tafs
Represented By: James W Balmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?